THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:40:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6209
Fax: (416) 469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CEDRIC GABILONDO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gabilondo (CPSO#: 96170 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
MICHAEL GARRON HOSPITAL
DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY
5TH FLOOR
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6209

Corporation Name: Dr. Cedric Gabilondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6209
Fax: (416) 469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CEDRIC GABILONDO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gabilondo (CPSO#: 96170 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
MICHAEL GARRON HOSPITAL
DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY
5TH FLOOR
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6209

Corporation Name: Dr. Cedric Gabilondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEDRIC SEBASTIAN GABILONDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABILONDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEDRIC SEBASTIAN GABILONDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABILONDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011