THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbour Family Medicine
201-770 Broadview
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Folkerson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Folkerson (CPSO#: 96182 )
Business Address: Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 680-1065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbour Family Medicine
201-770 Broadview
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Folkerson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Folkerson (CPSO#: 96182 )
Business Address: Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 680-1065

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE COLETTE FOLKERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLKERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE COLETTE FOLKERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLKERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011