THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dalby Family Practice
PO Box 3000
21 Hamilton Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-369-0264
Fax: 226-369-0246
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Upper Grand Family Health Team
107-6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Phone: (519) 843-3947
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela S. Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carlson (CPSO#: 96210 )
Business Address: 131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
5198432010
Business Address: 21 Hamilton Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(226) 369-0264
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dalby Family Practice
PO Box 3000
21 Hamilton Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-369-0264
Fax: 226-369-0246
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Upper Grand Family Health Team
107-6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Phone: (519) 843-3947
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela S. Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carlson (CPSO#: 96210 )
Business Address: 131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
5198432010
Business Address: 21 Hamilton Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(226) 369-0264
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA SUE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA SUE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011