THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 513-2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608763
Fax: 6476892276
Address: 310-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 1J4
Phone: 4166400661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Butty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Butty (CPSO#: 96216 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 101A - 4100 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2P 2B7
(416) 289-2318
Business Address: One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 640-0661
Business Address: West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building
Unit 308
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A9
(416) 760-0748

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 513-2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608763
Fax: 6476892276
Address: 310-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 1J4
Phone: 4166400661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Butty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Butty (CPSO#: 96216 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 101A - 4100 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2P 2B7
(416) 289-2318
Business Address: One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 640-0661
Business Address: West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building
Unit 308
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 3A9
(416) 760-0748

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIAD BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIAD BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011