THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:57:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 18 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francisco E. Vera Badillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vera Badillo (CPSO#: 96275 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75170

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 18 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francisco E. Vera Badillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vera Badillo (CPSO#: 96275 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75170

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jul 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 20 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Francisco Emilio Vera Badillo may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
Queen's University, in which Dr. Vera Badillo holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Vera
Badillo no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 18, 2015 and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Vera Badillo's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Francisco Emilio Vera Badillo may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
Queen's University, in which Dr. Vera Badillo holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Vera
Badillo no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 18, 2015 and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Vera Badillo's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011