THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:26:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 710 Dorval Drive
#202
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Missouri
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AHMAD KADHIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kadhim (CPSO#: 96305 )
Business Address: 560 Stonecliffe Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 4N9
6183150761

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 710 Dorval Drive
#202
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Missouri
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AHMAD KADHIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kadhim (CPSO#: 96305 )
Business Address: 560 Stonecliffe Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 4N9
6183150761

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD KADHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD KADHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011