THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:00:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Topiwala National Medical College, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Apr 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Souza (CPSO#: 96310 )
Business Address: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Topiwala National Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Apr 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Souza (CPSO#: 96310 )
Business Address: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROHAN DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal-Fetal Medicine, McMaster University, in which Dr. D'SOUZA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. D'SOUZA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. D'SOUZA's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROHAN DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal-Fetal Medicine, McMaster University, in which Dr. D'SOUZA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. D'SOUZA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. D'SOUZA's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Topiwala National Medical College, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011