THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:15:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 112-113
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Fax: (905) 636-9388
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
seashell medical centre
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: 905-693-6733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Al Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih (CPSO#: 85228 ) Dr. R. Al Sabbagh (CPSO#: 96365 )
Business Address: Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Business Address: 330 Bronte Street South
Units 112
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-6733

Corporation Name: Khalefih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih (CPSO#: 85228 ) Dr. R. Al Sabbagh (CPSO#: 96365 )
Business Address: Unit 112
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 636-9387

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 112-113
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Fax: (905) 636-9388
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
seashell medical centre
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: 905-693-6733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Al Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih (CPSO#: 85228 ) Dr. R. Al Sabbagh (CPSO#: 96365 )
Business Address: Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Business Address: 330 Bronte Street South
Units 112
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-6733

Corporation Name: Khalefih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih (CPSO#: 85228 ) Dr. R. Al Sabbagh (CPSO#: 96365 )
Business Address: Unit 112
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 636-9387

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REEM AL SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SABBAGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REEM AL SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011