THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 925 Wonderland Rd S
Advanced Western Medical Clinic
Unit B
London ON N6K 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-663-3334
Fax: 226-663-3876
Address: 925 Wonderland Rd S
Advanced Western Medical Clinic
Unit-B
London ON N6K 3R5
Phone: 226-663-3334
Fax: 226-663-3876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Amin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amin (CPSO#: 96373 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 925 Wonderland Rd S
Advanced Western Medical Clinic
Unit B
London ON N6K 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-663-3334
Fax: 226-663-3876
Address: 925 Wonderland Rd S
Advanced Western Medical Clinic
Unit-B
London ON N6K 3R5
Phone: 226-663-3334
Fax: 226-663-3876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Amin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amin (CPSO#: 96373 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011