THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:43:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: OCTOBER 6 UNIVERSITY, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 865 Regent St
Room 327
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 705 523 7256
Fax: 705 523 7266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Shurrab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shurrab (CPSO#: 96388 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: OCTOBER 6 UNIVERSITY, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 865 Regent St
Room 327
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 705 523 7256
Fax: 705 523 7266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Shurrab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shurrab (CPSO#: 96388 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED ALSADEQ NAGY SADEQ SHURRAB may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED ALSADEQ NAGY SADEQ SHURRAB may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: OCTOBER 6 UNIVERSITY, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011