THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:59:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hecht Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hecht (CPSO#: 96397 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 795-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hecht Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hecht (CPSO#: 96397 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 795-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN GRAHAM HECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN GRAHAM HECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011