THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
B3-161, Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 43872
Fax: 365-317-7891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.E. Serrano Aybar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Serrano Aybar (CPSO#: 96399 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4387
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Suite B3-161
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43872
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43872

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
B3-161, Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 43872
Fax: 365-317-7891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.E. Serrano Aybar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Serrano Aybar (CPSO#: 96399 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4387
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Suite B3-161
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43872
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43872

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pablo Emilio Serrano Aybar may practise medicine independently in general
surgery.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Pablo Emilio Serrano Aybar may practise medicine independently in general
surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011