THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:18:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Healthcare centre
Hospitalist/internal medicine
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199412410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Phone: 705-632-2015
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lavita Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gupta (CPSO#: 96429 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill road
BRANTFORD ONTARIO N3R 1G9
519-752-7871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Healthcare centre
Hospitalist/internal medicine
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199412410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Phone: 705-632-2015
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lavita Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gupta (CPSO#: 96429 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill road
BRANTFORD ONTARIO N3R 1G9
519-752-7871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAVITA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAVITA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011