THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:55:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
311
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199303019
Fax: 5192861622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farouq Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Manji (CPSO#: 96434 )
Business Address: 146 Unit B
Queen St W
Chatham Ontario N7M2G6
5193970635
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Unit 311
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
5199303019
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 438 Park Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1X2
(519) 397-1577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
311
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199303019
Fax: 5192861622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farouq Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Manji (CPSO#: 96434 )
Business Address: 146 Unit B
Queen St W
Chatham Ontario N7M2G6
5193970635
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Unit 311
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
5199303019
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 438 Park Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1X2
(519) 397-1577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAROUQ N MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAROUQ N MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011