THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:19:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Funk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Funk (CPSO#: 96449 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
B507
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4711
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
613-520-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Funk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Funk (CPSO#: 96449 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
B507
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4711
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
613-520-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BARRY ROY FUNK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BARRY ROY FUNK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011