THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:20:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2000
Extension: 5608
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivianne Freitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Freitas (CPSO#: 96464 )
Business Address: Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
The Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2000
Extension: 5608
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivianne Freitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Freitas (CPSO#: 96464 )
Business Address: Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
The Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Jul 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 14 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VIVIANNE AGUILERA ROLIM DE FREITAS may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. VIVIANNE AGUILERA ROLIM DE FREITAS may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011