THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:35:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Extension: 205352
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-491 EGLINGTON AVE. TORONTO
Kindercare Pediatrics
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosa Pereira dos Santos (CPSO#: 96477 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Address: 25 Industrial Street
Toronto Ontario M4G 1Z2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Extension: 205352
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-491 EGLINGTON AVE. TORONTO
Kindercare Pediatrics
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosa Pereira dos Santos (CPSO#: 96477 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Address: 25 Industrial Street
Toronto Ontario M4G 1Z2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANA ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANA ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011