THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:49:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1108 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristian Bernard Goulet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goulet (CPSO#: 96561 )
Business Address: 1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata ON K2K 0G1
6138544550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1108 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristian Bernard Goulet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goulet (CPSO#: 96561 )
Business Address: 1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata ON K2K 0G1
6138544550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIAN BERNARD GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIAN BERNARD GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2011