THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 12897450051
Fax: 18888985095
Address: 460 Brant street, Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: (289) 745-0051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 19056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Units 11-14
398 Steele Ave W
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waseem Hindieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hindieh (CPSO#: 96583 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
110 Harbor Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 0B7
Business Address: Suite 201
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Address: Suites 11-14
398 Steele Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
(905) 881-0334
Business Address: 6633 York Regional Road 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 472-7127
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 1A7
(905) 681-4818

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 12897450051
Fax: 18888985095
Address: 460 Brant street, Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: (289) 745-0051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 19056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Units 11-14
398 Steele Ave W
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waseem Hindieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hindieh (CPSO#: 96583 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
110 Harbor Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 0B7
Business Address: Suite 201
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Address: Suites 11-14
398 Steele Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
(905) 881-0334
Business Address: 6633 York Regional Road 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 472-7127
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 1A7
(905) 681-4818

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASEEM HEKMAT HINDIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDIEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASEEM HEKMAT HINDIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDIEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011