THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Red Hill Medical Group
337 Queenston Road
Ste 200
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 549-8863
Fax: (905) 549-4706
Address: St. Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Rd
Dundas Ontario L9H 5G7
Phone: (905) 627-3541
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
50 Charlton Avenue E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Ave
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7W9
Phone: (905) 383-0448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HHS/St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olawale Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 96628 )
Business Address: HHS/ St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Red hill Medical Group
200 - 337 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
(905) 549-8863
Business Address: St Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7W9
(905) 383-0448
Business Address: St Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Road
Dundas Ontario L9H 5G7
(905) 627-3541

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Red Hill Medical Group
337 Queenston Road
Ste 200
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 549-8863
Fax: (905) 549-4706
Address: St. Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Rd
Dundas Ontario L9H 5G7
Phone: (905) 627-3541
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
50 Charlton Avenue E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Ave
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7W9
Phone: (905) 383-0448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: HHS/St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olawale Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 96628 )
Business Address: HHS/ St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Red hill Medical Group
200 - 337 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
(905) 549-8863
Business Address: St Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7W9
(905) 383-0448
Business Address: St Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Road
Dundas Ontario L9H 5G7
(905) 627-3541

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Feb 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 22 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Olawale Olugbenga Ayeni may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Olawale Olugbenga Ayeni may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011