THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Soudan Ave
Toronto ON M4S 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473003132
Fax: 6477776149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Toronto
Koffler Student Services Centre
Main Floor
111-214 College Street
Toronto ON M5T 2Z9
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KASRA KOOCHESFAHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koochesfahani (CPSO#: 96630 )
Business Address: 339 Soudan Ave
Toronto ON M4S 1W6
6473003132

Corporation Name: Kasra Koochesfahani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Soudan Ave
Toronto ON M4S 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473003132
Fax: 6477776149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Toronto
Koffler Student Services Centre
Main Floor
111-214 College Street
Toronto ON M5T 2Z9
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KASRA KOOCHESFAHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koochesfahani (CPSO#: 96630 )
Business Address: 339 Soudan Ave
Toronto ON M4S 1W6
6473003132

Corporation Name: Kasra Koochesfahani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASRA MOHSENI KOOCHESFAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOOCHESFAHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASRA MOHSENI KOOCHESFAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOOCHESFAHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2011