THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheung (CPSO#: 96639 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Equipe De Sante Familiale Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 813-3850

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheung (CPSO#: 96639 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Equipe De Sante Familiale Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 813-3850

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL KAR-CHUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL KAR-CHUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2011