THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:21:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165060804
Extension: 3286
Fax: 4162994526
Address: 170 Queensway West
Suite 202
Next to Trillium main hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Phone: 9055815505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaula Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mehta (CPSO#: 96646 )
Business Address: Anova Fertility
650 - 25 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 6S6
(416) 225-4440
Business Address: unit 202-170 Queensway West
TRIO Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
4168246466
Business Address: 205-4025 Yonge St
Suite #215
Toronto ON M2P 2E3
416.506.0804 Extn: ext. 3286
Business Address: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
4165060804

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU
Medical School: University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165060804
Extension: 3286
Fax: 4162994526
Address: 170 Queensway West
Suite 202
Next to Trillium main hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Phone: 9055815505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaula Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mehta (CPSO#: 96646 )
Business Address: Anova Fertility
650 - 25 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 6S6
(416) 225-4440
Business Address: unit 202-170 Queensway West
TRIO Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
4168246466
Business Address: 205-4025 Yonge St
Suite #215
Toronto ON M2P 2E3
416.506.0804 Extn: ext. 3286
Business Address: 655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
4165060804

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAULA ASHISH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAULA ASHISH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2011