THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:52:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baroda University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue, Suite 164
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 948-8000
Fax: (519) 948-9191
Address: WINDSOR REGIONAL HOSPITAL OUELLETTE
1030 OUELLETTE AVENUE
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Bayshore infusion clinic
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
Phone: +1 877-235-7798
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Padmaja Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Naidu (CPSO#: 96647 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Baroda University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue, Suite 164
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 948-8000
Fax: (519) 948-9191
Address: WINDSOR REGIONAL HOSPITAL OUELLETTE
1030 OUELLETTE AVENUE
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Bayshore infusion clinic
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
Phone: +1 877-235-7798
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Padmaja Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Naidu (CPSO#: 96647 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Padmaja Rakesh Naidu may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Padmaja Rakesh Naidu may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baroda University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Apr 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2011