THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abu Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Awad (CPSO#: 96650 )
Business Address: 71 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S2
9058854555
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abu Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Awad (CPSO#: 96650 )
Business Address: 71 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S2
9058854555
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASSER ABD ALJALIL ABU AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU AWAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASSER ABD ALJALIL ABU AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU AWAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2011