THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:55:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WIndsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 25 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 96656 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WIndsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 25 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 96656 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Feb 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 15 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rasna Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
and medical oncology, only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rasna Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
and medical oncology, only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011