THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-5858
Fax: (519) 743-5851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suhail (CPSO#: 96684 )
Business Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Suite 104
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
5197435858

Corporation Name: Suhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-5858
Fax: (519) 743-5851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suhail (CPSO#: 96684 )
Business Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Suite 104
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
5197435858

Corporation Name: Suhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ SUHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUHAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ SUHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUHAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2011