THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:57:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rush Medical College, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 425 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 2W8
Phone: (905) 458-9272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M4
Phone: 905-569-7155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 8131100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 Dundas St W
Erin Mills Lodge
Mississauga ON L5K 2K7
Phone: 905-823-7273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: As von Schlegell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. von Schlegell (CPSO#: 96697 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rush Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 425 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 2W8
Phone: (905) 458-9272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M4
Phone: 905-569-7155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 8131100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 Dundas St W
Erin Mills Lodge
Mississauga ON L5K 2K7
Phone: 905-823-7273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Nov 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: As von Schlegell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. von Schlegell (CPSO#: 96697 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ahmad Shariff von Schlegell may practise medicine independently in
geriatric medicine and palliative care medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ahmad Shariff von Schlegell may practise medicine independently in
geriatric medicine and palliative care medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rush Medical College, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2011