THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Gordon St
Lakeridge Health Whitby
Diabetes Education Program
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 53726
Fax: 905-665-2404
Address: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Diabetes Education Program
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Extension: 21247
Fax: 623-697-4695
Address: Lakeridge Health Whitby
Diabetes Education Program
300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 54342
Fax: 905-665-2404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angeline Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 96707 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331 Extn: 1247
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4342
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4982
Business Address: Oshawa Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3X6
(905) 723-0036

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Gordon St
Lakeridge Health Whitby
Diabetes Education Program
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 53726
Fax: 905-665-2404
Address: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Diabetes Education Program
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Extension: 21247
Fax: 623-697-4695
Address: Lakeridge Health Whitby
Diabetes Education Program
300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 54342
Fax: 905-665-2404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angeline Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 96707 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331 Extn: 1247
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4342
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4982
Business Address: Oshawa Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3X6
(905) 723-0036

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELINE YING WING CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELINE YING WING CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2011