THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:23:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Saggar, Barjinder (Used Until: 30 Mar 2016)
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 110-2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057932444
Fax: 9057933444
Address: 2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Unit 5
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J6
Phone: 905-463-1337
Fax: 905-463-1338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby Saggar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saggar (CPSO#: 96711 )
Business Address: Suite 110
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
(905) 793-2444

General Information

Former Name: Saggar, Barjinder (Used Until: 30 Mar 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 110-2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057932444
Fax: 9057933444
Address: 2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Unit 5
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J6
Phone: 905-463-1337
Fax: 905-463-1338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby Saggar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saggar (CPSO#: 96711 )
Business Address: Suite 110
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3Y5
(905) 793-2444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBY SAGGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBY SAGGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2011