THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:25:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West London Family Health Clinic
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jiajia Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu (CPSO#: 96742 )
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712

Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West London Family Health Clinic
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jiajia Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu (CPSO#: 96742 )
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712

Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIAJIA ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIAJIA ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2011