THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma (CPSO#: 96743 )
Business Address: Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 0Z3
(705) 726-1191

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma (CPSO#: 96743 )
Business Address: Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 0Z3
(705) 726-1191

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Feb 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 07 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Niti Sharma may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Niti Sharma may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011