THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:26:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iraq

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wasan Al-Shaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Al-Shaar (CPSO#: 96746 )
Business Address: Nebo Medical Centre
260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
(905) 381-9800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iraq

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wasan Al-Shaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Al-Shaar (CPSO#: 96746 )
Business Address: Nebo Medical Centre
260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
(905) 381-9800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASAN AL-SHAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASAN AL-SHAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011