THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 21:11:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75155
Fax: (905) 570-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weingarten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weingarten (CPSO#: 96757 )
Business Address: Health Sciences Centre
Division of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75155
Fax: (905) 570-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weingarten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weingarten (CPSO#: 96757 )
Business Address: Health Sciences Centre
Division of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA WEINGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINGARTEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA WEINGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINGARTEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2011