THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 677-7933
Fax: (647) 933-0199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arman Homat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Homat (CPSO#: 96788 )
Business Address: 207-7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8H9
(647) 677-7933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 677-7933
Fax: (647) 933-0199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arman Homat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Homat (CPSO#: 96788 )
Business Address: 207-7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8H9
(647) 677-7933

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Arman Homat may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Arman Homat may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2011