THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
suite 1-3
MCI The Doctor's office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057640188
Fax: 9057640189
Address: Tendercare Living Center
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2J6
Phone: (416) 499-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Seven Oaks - Long-Term Care Home
9 Neilson Rd Toronto
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E1
Phone: 416-392-3500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chartwell Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J3P4
Phone: (416) 443-1074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bendale Acers Long Term Care
2920 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: (416) 397-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Extendicare Rouge Valley
550 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
Phone: (416) 282-6768
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Altamont-Leisureworld, Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill Ontario M1C 2P5
Phone: (416) 284-4781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adel F. Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Girgis (CPSO#: 96803 )
Business Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
300 John Street
Suite 203
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 764-0188
Business Address: Dufferin Family Center
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York Ontario M3J 2N4
(416) 739-1562
Business Address: Tendercare Living Centre
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2J6
(416) 499-2020
Business Address: Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 285-7575
Business Address: Seven Oaks Long Term Care Home
9 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E1
(416) 392-3500
Business Address: Chartwell Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3P4
(416) 443-1074
Business Address: Bendale Acres Long Term Care
2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M2J 4A8
(416) 397-7000
Business Address: Extendicare Rouge Valley
551 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
(416) 282-6768
Business Address: Altamont-Leisureworld Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill Ontario M1C 2P5
(416) 284-4781
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
(905) 764-0188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Unit 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctors Office
Suite 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
suite 1-3
MCI The Doctor's office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057640188
Fax: 9057640189
Address: Tendercare Living Center
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2J6
Phone: (416) 499-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Seven Oaks - Long-Term Care Home
9 Neilson Rd Toronto
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E1
Phone: 416-392-3500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chartwell Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J3P4
Phone: (416) 443-1074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bendale Acers Long Term Care
2920 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T8
Phone: (416) 397-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Extendicare Rouge Valley
550 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
Phone: (416) 282-6768
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Altamont-Leisureworld, Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill Ontario M1C 2P5
Phone: (416) 284-4781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adel F. Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Girgis (CPSO#: 96803 )
Business Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
300 John Street
Suite 203
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 764-0188
Business Address: Dufferin Family Center
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York Ontario M3J 2N4
(416) 739-1562
Business Address: Tendercare Living Centre
1020 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2J6
(416) 499-2020
Business Address: Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 285-7575
Business Address: Seven Oaks Long Term Care Home
9 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E1
(416) 392-3500
Business Address: Chartwell Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3P4
(416) 443-1074
Business Address: Bendale Acres Long Term Care
2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M2J 4A8
(416) 397-7000
Business Address: Extendicare Rouge Valley
551 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
(416) 282-6768
Business Address: Altamont-Leisureworld Senior Care
92 Island Road
West Hill Ontario M1C 2P5
(416) 284-4781
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
(905) 764-0188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctor's Office
Unit 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
MCI The Doctors Office
Suite 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
9057640188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL FEKRY TAWADROS GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL FEKRY TAWADROS GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2011