THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:16:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolar (CPSO#: 96820 )
Business Address: Queen's University, Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care - Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 544-4900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolar (CPSO#: 96820 )
Business Address: Queen's University, Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care - Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 544-4900

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Apr 2022
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 26 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dusan Kolar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Kolar holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.


Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2011, and expires on June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Kolar's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 1 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dusan Kolar may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Kolar holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.


Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2011, and expires on June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Kolar's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 1 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2011