THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:51:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Of Parma, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
KARMA IVF
Suite 508
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 James St S
SUGO Clinic, Specialized Ultrasound in Obstetrics and Gynecology
Unit 305
Hamilton ON L8P 3A9
Phone: 905 522 2220
Fax: 905 522 2280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sacchini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sacchini (CPSO#: 96829 )
Business Address: 200 James St S
SUGO Clinic
Specialized Ultrasound Ginecology
305
Hamilton ON L8P 3A9
905 522 2220
Business Address: Karma Clinic
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
519-570-3660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University Of Parma, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
KARMA IVF
Suite 508
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 James St S
SUGO Clinic, Specialized Ultrasound in Obstetrics and Gynecology
Unit 305
Hamilton ON L8P 3A9
Phone: 905 522 2220
Fax: 905 522 2280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sacchini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sacchini (CPSO#: 96829 )
Business Address: 200 James St S
SUGO Clinic
Specialized Ultrasound Ginecology
305
Hamilton ON L8P 3A9
905 522 2220
Business Address: Karma Clinic
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
519-570-3660

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Clara Sacchini may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and
gynaecology limited to maternal fetal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Clara Sacchini may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and
gynaecology limited to maternal fetal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Of Parma, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2011