THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: 519-372-3940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 22 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Indermohan Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sandhu (CPSO#: 96851 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: 519-372-3940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 22 Feb 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Indermohan Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sandhu (CPSO#: 96851 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Feb 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 22 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Indermohan Singh Sandhu may practice medicine independently in medical
oncology and haematology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Indermohan Singh Sandhu may practice medicine independently in medical
oncology and haematology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011