THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH, FLEMISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Obstetrics and Gynae
Suite 3-912
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 586 4800
Extension: 6406
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 10 May 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Van Mieghem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van Mieghem (CPSO#: 96852 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 6406
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
Room 3-912
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 6406

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH, FLEMISH
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Obstetrics and Gynae
Suite 3-912
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 586 4800
Extension: 6406
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 10 May 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Van Mieghem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van Mieghem (CPSO#: 96852 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 6406
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
Room 3-912
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 6406

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 13 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Tim Nicole Constant Van Mieghem may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Van
Mieghem holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Van
Mieghem no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Tim Nicole Constant Van Mieghem may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Van
Mieghem holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Van
Mieghem no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2022
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 May 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2011