THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Georgetown University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vitreous Retina Macula Specialists of Toronto
3280 Bloor St. W. Suite 310
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2X3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 647-361-7575
Fax: 647-361-4585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Netan Choudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Choudhry (CPSO#: 96870 )
Business Address: 3280 Bloor Street West
Suite 310
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2X3
(647) 361-7575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Georgetown University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vitreous Retina Macula Specialists of Toronto
3280 Bloor St. W. Suite 310
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2X3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 647-361-7575
Fax: 647-361-4585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Netan Choudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Choudhry (CPSO#: 96870 )
Business Address: 3280 Bloor Street West
Suite 310
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2X3
(647) 361-7575

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
08 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from August 8, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Netan Choudhry in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Choudhry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. NETAN CHOUDHRY
(“Dr. Choudhry”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICR Committee” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Choudhry, certificate of registration number 96870, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College has received information that I was arrested and charged with criminal offences under the Criminal Code of Canada as follows: sexual assault (2 counts) contrary to s. 271; sexual interference with a person under sixteen (2 counts) contrary to s. 151; invitation to sexual touching to a person under the age of sixteen contrary to s. 152; assault causing bodily harm contrary to s. 267(b); and uttering threats to cause death or bodily harm, contrary to s. 264.1(1)(a) (collectively the “Charges” under the Criminal Code). I acknowledge that the College is monitoring these Charges.

(4) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order under section 25.4 of the Code at a later date in accordance with the Code.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately (“Effective Date”).

(6) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old until the following condition has been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of my intention to resume seeing and treating patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

(7) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “A”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Choudhry shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (7)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A”.

(c) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).

(f) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital or other setting, in its sole discretion.

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(13) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(14) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(15) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Choudhry has agreed that he shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old and shall provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of his intention to resume seeing and treating any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

Dr. Choudhry shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Choudhry will not see or treat any patients under eighteen (18) years of age. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

(2 of 2)

Dr. Netan Choudhry may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from August 8, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Netan Choudhry in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Choudhry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. NETAN CHOUDHRY
(“Dr. Choudhry”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICR Committee” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Choudhry, certificate of registration number 96870, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College has received information that I was arrested and charged with criminal offences under the Criminal Code of Canada as follows: sexual assault (2 counts) contrary to s. 271; sexual interference with a person under sixteen (2 counts) contrary to s. 151; invitation to sexual touching to a person under the age of sixteen contrary to s. 152; assault causing bodily harm contrary to s. 267(b); and uttering threats to cause death or bodily harm, contrary to s. 264.1(1)(a) (collectively the “Charges” under the Criminal Code). I acknowledge that the College is monitoring these Charges.

(4) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order under section 25.4 of the Code at a later date in accordance with the Code.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately (“Effective Date”).

(6) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old until the following condition has been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of my intention to resume seeing and treating patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

(7) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “A”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Choudhry shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (7)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A”.

(c) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).

(f) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital or other setting, in its sole discretion.

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(13) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(14) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(15) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Choudhry, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Choudhry has agreed that he shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old and shall provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of his intention to resume seeing and treating any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

Dr. Choudhry shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Choudhry will not see or treat any patients under eighteen (18) years of age. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Choudhry, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

(2 of 2)

Dr. Netan Choudhry may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Aug 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Netan Choudhry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2024:
 
Dr. Choudhry has agreed that he shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old and shall provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of his intention to resume seeing and treating any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

Dr. Choudhry shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Choudhry will not see or treat any patients under eighteen (18) years of age. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On April 30, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Netan Choudhry:

1. Choudhry must reside at specified address.
2. Choudhry must notify police of his address in writing within 24 hours of any subsequent change in address.
3. Choudhry must not contact or communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person, except in the presence of or through legal counsel.
4. Choudhry must not attend a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre, except while in the presence of a person over the age of 18 years old who is aware of these allegations, or while attending 
Life Time Fitness.
5. Choudhry must not be in the presence of anyone under the age of 16, except:
• as approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario; or
• while in the presence of a person over 18 years old who is aware of the allegations; or
• while in the direct and continuous presence of the person under 16’s legal guardian; or
• while attending Life Time Fitness; or 
• other specified condition.
6. Choudhry must not communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons, except with specified conditions.
7. Choudhry must not attend within 100 metres of any place he knows named persons to live, work, attend school, or happen to be, except with specified conditions.
8. Choudhry must not attend within 100 metres of specified address, with specified conditions.
9. Choudhry must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
10. Choudhry must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
11. Choudhry must report these allegations to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as required by the College and comply with any practice restrictions the College deems appropriate in the circumstances.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Charges 
 
Netan Choudhry was charged with the following offences: 
 
1. Sexual Assault, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
2. Sexual Interference with a person under 16 years of age, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
3. Invitation to Sexual Touching to a person under 16 years of age, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
4. Assault Causing Bodily Harm, between October 17, 2016 and March 25, 2024, contrary to section 267(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
5. Sexual Assault, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
6. Sexual Interference with a person under 16 years of age, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
7. Invitation to Sexual Touching to a person under 16 years of age, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
 
Date of Charge: April 24, April 30 and May 24, 2024 
Place of Charge: Newmarket, Ontario 
York Regional Police Service 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Aug 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Netan Choudhry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2024:
 
Dr. Choudhry has agreed that he shall not see or treat any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old and shall provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days written notice to the College of his intention to resume seeing and treating any patients under the age of eighteen (18) years old.

Dr. Choudhry shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Choudhry will not see or treat any patients under eighteen (18) years of age. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On April 30, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Netan Choudhry:

1. Choudhry must reside at specified address.
2. Choudhry must notify police of his address in writing within 24 hours of any subsequent change in address.
3. Choudhry must not contact or communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person, except in the presence of or through legal counsel.
4. Choudhry must not attend a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre, except while in the presence of a person over the age of 18 years old who is aware of these allegations, or while attending 
Life Time Fitness.
5. Choudhry must not be in the presence of anyone under the age of 16, except:
• as approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario; or
• while in the presence of a person over 18 years old who is aware of the allegations; or
• while in the direct and continuous presence of the person under 16’s legal guardian; or
• while attending Life Time Fitness; or 
• other specified condition.
6. Choudhry must not communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons, except with specified conditions.
7. Choudhry must not attend within 100 metres of any place he knows named persons to live, work, attend school, or happen to be, except with specified conditions.
8. Choudhry must not attend within 100 metres of specified address, with specified conditions.
9. Choudhry must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
10. Choudhry must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
11. Choudhry must report these allegations to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as required by the College and comply with any practice restrictions the College deems appropriate in the circumstances.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Charges 
 
Netan Choudhry was charged with the following offences: 
 
1. Sexual Assault, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
2. Sexual Interference with a person under 16 years of age, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
3. Invitation to Sexual Touching to a person under 16 years of age, between September 1, 2014 and October 17, 2016, contrary to section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
4. Assault Causing Bodily Harm, between October 17, 2016 and March 25, 2024, contrary to section 267(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
5. Sexual Assault, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
6. Sexual Interference with a person under 16 years of age, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
7. Invitation to Sexual Touching to a person under 16 years of age, between October 17, 2019 and March 31, 2024, contrary to section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
 
Date of Charge: April 24, April 30 and May 24, 2024 
Place of Charge: Newmarket, Ontario 
York Regional Police Service 

Training

Medical School: Georgetown University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2011