THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Malton Medical Group
Unit 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 677-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Jawaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jawaid (CPSO#: 96875 )
Business Address: 201-6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
9056774200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Malton Medical Group
Unit 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 677-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Jawaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jawaid (CPSO#: 96875 )
Business Address: 201-6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
9056774200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 May 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 22 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mehvish Jawaid may practise medicine independently in Family
Medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mehvish Jawaid may practise medicine independently in Family
Medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2011