THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 - 4515 Ebenezer road
Brampton Ontario L6P 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 794-9685
Fax: (905) 794-2826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Puneeta Gambhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gambhir (CPSO#: 96885 )
Business Address: Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 2K7
(905) 794-9685

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 - 4515 Ebenezer road
Brampton Ontario L6P 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 794-9685
Fax: (905) 794-2826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Puneeta Gambhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gambhir (CPSO#: 96885 )
Business Address: Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 2K7
(905) 794-9685

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNEETA GAMBHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBHIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNEETA GAMBHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBHIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2011