THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:22:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Auzair Tak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tak (CPSO#: 96902 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Organization
Suite 409
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Auzair Tak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tak (CPSO#: 96902 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Organization
Suite 409
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUZAIR AHMED TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUZAIR AHMED TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011