THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 252-3632
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie shores health care
Emergency Medicine
main floor
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 1-519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: 5199734411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Rose City Endoscopy
Unit 1060
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: 5192544154
Fax: 5192544158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anderson (CPSO#: 96915 )
Business Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
5192544154
Business Address: 1030 Ouellete Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 1750 Division Road
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 252-3632
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie shores health care
Emergency Medicine
main floor
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 1-519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: 5199734411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Rose City Endoscopy
Unit 1060
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: 5192544154
Fax: 5192544158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anderson (CPSO#: 96915 )
Business Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
5192544154
Business Address: 1030 Ouellete Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 1750 Division Road
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011