THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:14:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Swaminathan, Enoka Geraldine (Used Until: 01 Oct 2020)
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Copper Creek Drive
MedCare Clinics @ Walmart Markham
Markham Ontario L6B 0S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052051400
Fax: 9052050088
Address: 20 Rivermont Road
MedCare Clinics @ Riverview Heights
Unit B8-B9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G7
Phone: 905-454-1222
Fax: 905-455-0123
Address: E2-7555 Montrose Road
MedCare Clinics @ Niagara Square
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 2E9
Phone: 289-292-0441
Fax: 289-292-0451
Address: 3600 Major Mackenzie Drive West
MedCare Clinics @ Walmart Vaughan
Vaughan Ontario L4H 3T6
Phone: 905-303-4003
Fax: 905-303-4305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enoka Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Richards (CPSO#: 96927 )
Business Address: 3600 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Located Inside Walmart
Vaughan Ontario L6A 1C1
905-303-4003
Business Address: E2-7555 Montrose Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 2E9
Business Address: 20 Rivermont Road
MedCare Clinics @ Riverview Heights
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G7
905-454-1222
Business Address: 500 Copper Creek Road
Markham Ontario L6B 0S1
905-205-1400

General Information

Former Name: Swaminathan, Enoka Geraldine (Used Until: 01 Oct 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Copper Creek Drive
MedCare Clinics @ Walmart Markham
Markham Ontario L6B 0S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052051400
Fax: 9052050088
Address: 20 Rivermont Road
MedCare Clinics @ Riverview Heights
Unit B8-B9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G7
Phone: 905-454-1222
Fax: 905-455-0123
Address: E2-7555 Montrose Road
MedCare Clinics @ Niagara Square
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 2E9
Phone: 289-292-0441
Fax: 289-292-0451
Address: 3600 Major Mackenzie Drive West
MedCare Clinics @ Walmart Vaughan
Vaughan Ontario L4H 3T6
Phone: 905-303-4003
Fax: 905-303-4305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enoka Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Richards (CPSO#: 96927 )
Business Address: 3600 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Located Inside Walmart
Vaughan Ontario L6A 1C1
905-303-4003
Business Address: E2-7555 Montrose Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 2E9
Business Address: 20 Rivermont Road
MedCare Clinics @ Riverview Heights
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G7
905-454-1222
Business Address: 500 Copper Creek Road
Markham Ontario L6B 0S1
905-205-1400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOKA GERALDINE SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOKA GERALDINE SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011