THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 786 Goderich St
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264532230
Fax: 2262771122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather J. Gleba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gleba (CPSO#: 96933 )
Business Address: Dr. Early Health Centre
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C3
(226) 453-2230
Business Address: 340 High Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 786 Goderich St
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264532230
Fax: 2262771122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather J. Gleba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gleba (CPSO#: 96933 )
Business Address: Dr. Early Health Centre
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C3
(226) 453-2230
Business Address: 340 High Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JOY GLEBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER JOY GLEBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2011