THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3804
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH SAWYER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3804
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH SAWYER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011