THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chan (CPSO#: 96972 )
Business Address: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1T1
(416) 495-9902

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chan (CPSO#: 96972 )
Business Address: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1T1
(416) 495-9902

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2011