THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-724-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6981 Millecreek Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Doak Ln
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chitra Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ramdass (CPSO#: 96992 )
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Address: 270 Doak Lane
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A5
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-724-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6981 Millecreek Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Doak Ln
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chitra Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ramdass (CPSO#: 96992 )
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Address: 270 Doak Lane
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 0A5
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHITRA RAMDASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMDASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHITRA RAMDASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMDASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2011